CA SB1220 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 487, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 487, Statutes of 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 35002 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Vehicles: emergency vehicles: fire apparatus.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1220 Wolk Urgency Clause (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 1220 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1220 Wolk Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-12 - Assembly - SB 1220 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1220 Wolk Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 487, Statutes of 2010. | |
2010-09-29 | Approved by Governor. | |
2010-08-20 | Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2010-08-19 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4650.) To enrollment. | |
2010-08-12 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2010-08-12 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6179.) To Senate. | |
2010-08-09 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-08-05 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.) | |
2010-06-29 | Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2010-06-28 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |
2010-06-24 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 21) | |
2010-06-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-06-14 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-28 | To Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-05-10 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2010-05-10 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3477.) To Assembly. | |
2010-05-06 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3445.) | |
2010-04-06 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-02-19 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |