CA SB1208 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 840, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 840, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 731 to, and to add and repeal Section 910.8 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.
Title
Low-income utility customer assistance programs: concurrent application process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1208 Hueso et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1208 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Alvarez (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1208 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1208 Hueso Senate Third Reading By Alvarez (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1208 Hueso (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 840, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5374.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3878.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3788.) (May 19). |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3509.) (April 26). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 731 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 910.8 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |