CA SB1186 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 33000, 33030, 33031, 33032, 33111, and 33301 of, to add Chapter 1.7 (commencing with Section 33090) to Part 20 of Division 2 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Section 33034 of, the Education Code, relating to education governance.
Title
Education governance.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-05-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Held in committee and under submission. | |
2010-05-21 | Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2010-05-17 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2010-05-07 | Set for hearing May 17. | |
2010-05-05 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-04-30 | Set for hearing May 10. | |
2010-04-22 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3295.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-04-08 | Set for hearing April 21. | |
2010-04-07 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2010-03-17 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2010-03-04 | To Com. on ED. | |
2010-02-19 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 21. | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |