CA SB1181 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 22062 of the Financial Code, relating to lending.
Title
Finance lenders.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-23 - Assembly - SB 1181 Correa Senate Third Reading By HARKEY (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1181 Correa (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-09 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1181 Correa (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-06-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-06-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5648.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 9). |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3266.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3161.) (April 9). |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 22062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |