CA SB1176 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14837 and 14838 of the Government Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Small Business Procurement and Contract Act: business size.
Sponsors
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D] |
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1176 Galgiani Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1176 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1176 Galgiani Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1176 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1176 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1176 Galgiani Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1176 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-25 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-25 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5489.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6233.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5963.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4047.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4005.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3494.) (April 12). |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14837 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14838 | Amended Code | Citation Text |