CA SB1162 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 597.1 of the Penal Code, relating to animal control, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Animal control: tranquilizers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1162 Runner Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1162 Runner Third Reading Urgency By KNIGHT (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1162 Runner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1162 Runner Third Reading Urgency By KNIGHT (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 SB1162 Runner (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 594, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. | |
2012-08-31 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5081.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-30 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6671.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6672.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-29 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6555.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-22 | Read third time and amended. (Page 6150.) Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-21 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (August 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-05 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-07-02 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-07-02 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4222.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-06-26 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-25 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-06-16 | Set for hearing June 25. | |
2012-06-14 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. | |
2012-06-13 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |
2012-05-22 | Set for hearing June 12. | |
2012-05-21 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Corrected May 29.) | |
2012-05-17 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3515.) (May 14). | |
2012-05-09 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-03 | Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and PUB. S. | |
2012-05-02 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-05-01 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-03-29 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-03-22 | Re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S. | |
2012-03-20 | Set for hearing April 10. | |
2012-03-19 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |
2012-02-23 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. | |
2012-02-22 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10295 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10332 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 2003 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2807 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 597.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |