CA SB1150 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 838, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 838, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2920.7 to the Civil Code, relating to mortgages and deeds of trust.
Title
Mortgages and deeds of trust: mortgage servicers: successors in interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1150 Leno Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1150 Leno Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1150 Leno Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1150 Leno (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1150 Leno Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1150 Leno (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 1150 Leno Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1150 Leno Senate Third Reading Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1150 Leno (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1150 Leno Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1150 Leno (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 838, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 5373.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6012.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5949.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 28). |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 20). |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 4083.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 18. Noes 18. Page 4065.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4066.) |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3766.) (May 3). |
2016-04-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 3606.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | April 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2920.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |