CA SB1146 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-26 - June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2601 of the Penal Code, relating to prisoners.
Title
Prisoners: rights.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1146 Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1146 Stone (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | June 12 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4939.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4818.) (April 24). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 245 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |