CA SB1142 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1872.85 of the Insurance Code, relating to health insurance.
Title
Health insurance fraud: annual special purpose assessments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1142 Monning Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 1142 Monning Senate Third Reading By PEREA (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1142 Monning (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-07 - Assembly - SB 1142 Monning Senate Third Reading By PEREA (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1142 Monning (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 251, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4402.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-07 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 5905.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 25). |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3321.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3281.) (April 24). |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 1872.85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |