CA SB1132 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 21453 and 21971 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: right turn violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1132 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4454.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4304.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-16SenateApril 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4517.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code21453New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code21971New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code42001.15New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback