CA SB1125 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - April 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 3439.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-19 - April 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 3439.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 3204.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to oil and gas.
Title
Oil and gas: alternative to bond requirement: financial accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-19 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-19-2022]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | Senate | April 19 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 6. Page 3439.) Reconsideration granted. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3204.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |