CA SB1104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-11 - August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13978.8 of, and to add Section 12096.3.6 to, the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Governor’s Office of Business and Economic Development: Office of Freight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1104 Gonzalez (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1104 Gonzalez (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and TRANS. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3878.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3783.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 3441.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3167.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing March 21. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and TRANS. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12096.3.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 13978.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |