CA SB1094 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65965, 65966, 65967, and 65968 of the Government Code, relating to land use, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Land use: mitigation lands: nonprofit organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1094 Kehoe Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1094 Kehoe Third Reading Urgency By ALEJO (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1094 Kehoe Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1094 Kehoe Third Reading Urgency By ALEJO (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1094 Kehoe Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 705, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 a.m. | |
2012-08-30 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5026.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-24 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-23 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6195.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-08 | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-27 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |
2012-05-31 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-31 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3743.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3590.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-22 | Set for hearing May 24. | |
2012-05-21 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected May 18.) | |
2012-05-11 | Set for hearing May 21. | |
2012-04-30 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-04-27 | Set for hearing May 7. | |
2012-04-26 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3304.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-04-17 | Set for hearing April 25. | |
2012-04-16 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |
2012-04-12 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3121.) (April 10). | |
2012-04-09 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2012-03-23 | Set for hearing April 10. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and GOV. & F. | |
2012-02-17 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65965 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65966 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65967 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65968 | Amended Code | Citation Text |