CA SB1091 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 868.5 of the Penal Code, relating to witness testimony.
Title
Witness testimony: support persons.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-07-02 - Assembly - SB 1091 Pavley Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1091 Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1091 Pavley (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |
2012-07-02 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-07-02 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 5564.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-06-27 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |
2012-06-14 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-04-23 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-04-23 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3241.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-04-19 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3208.) (April 17). | |
2012-03-13 | Set for hearing April 17. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2012-02-16 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 868.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |