CA SB1090 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - May 26 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - May 26 hearing: Heard for testimony only.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 30237 to the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.
Title
Coastal erosion: installation of shoreline protective devices: application process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | May 26 hearing: Heard for testimony only. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 26. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 30237 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1090 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1090 |