CA SB1087 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1560, 1561, and 1563 of the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.
Title
Evidence: production of business records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1087 Anderson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Assembly - SB 1087 Anderson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1087 Anderson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Assembly - SB 1087 Anderson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB1087 Anderson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-07-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4653.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5402.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3631.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3520.) (April 12). |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3314.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 1560 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 1561 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Evidence Code | 1563 | Amended Code | Citation Text |