CA SB1083 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal, amend, and add Section 11450 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalWORKs.
Title
CalWORKs: pregnancy and homeless assistance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Assembly - SB 1083 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Holden (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1083 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1083 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1083 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1083 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5333.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3933.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3782.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3324.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |