CA SB1082 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Section 1810 of the Vehicle Code, relating to the Department of Motor Vehicles.
Title
Department of Motor Vehicles: records: inspection and sale.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Dahle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | March 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 1810 | New Code | See Bill Text |