CA SB1081 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 3033, 7150, and 7151 of, and to add Sections 3034 and 7150.5 to, the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Hunting and sport fishing: free and reduced license fees: veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | April 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3312.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 3033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 3034 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 7150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 7150.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Fish and Game Code | 7151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |