CA SB1077 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 291, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 291, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 125.9, 7591.18, 7591.19, and 7599.70 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 7590.1, 7591.10, 7593.1, 7593.6, 7593.7, 7594.4, 7599.32, 7599.34, 7599.42, 7599.43, 7599.48, and 7599.61 of, and to add Sections 7591.13, 7593.5, 7593.15, and 7593.16 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to alarm companies.
Title
Alarm companies: limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1077 Price Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1077 Price Senate Third Reading By NESTANDE (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1077 Price (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-21 - Assembly - SB 1077 Price Senate Third Reading By NESTANDE (Y: 69 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1077 Price (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 291, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-27 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-22 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4698.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-08-21 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-08-21 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 7. Page 6059.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-08-13 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-09 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). | |
2012-06-27 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and JUD. | |
2012-05-30 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3714.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-05-16 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-05-15 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. | |
2012-05-04 | Set for hearing May 14. | |
2012-05-01 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-30 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3309.) (April 24). | |
2012-04-19 | Set for hearing April 24. | |
2012-04-17 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3188.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-11 | Set for hearing April 16. | |
2012-04-09 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2012-03-21 | Set for hearing April 9. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. | |
2012-02-15 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |