CA SB1064 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5016 to the Penal Code, relating to prisons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisons: confidential informants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1064 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1064 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1064 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-30 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2020-09-30 Vetoed by the Governor.
2020-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2020-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 9.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 10.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-25AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-24AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 20).
2020-08-18AssemblyAugust 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-08-06AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-27AssemblyAugust 3 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-06-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 3880.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3768.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3569.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2020-03-18SenateMarch 24 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-05SenateSet for hearing March 24.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2020-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code5016New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback