CA SB1061 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 6704, 6706.3, 6730, 6737.3, 6738, 6740, 6741, and 6787 of, to add Sections 6702.3, 6702.4, 6702.5, 6702.6, 6702.7, 6702.8, 6702.9, 6702.10, 6702.11, 6730.6, 6730.7, and 6731.7 to, and to repeal Section 6704.1 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to engineers, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Professional engineers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-04-11 | Set for hearing April 23. | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. | |
2012-02-14 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_1061&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_1051-1100/sb_1061_bill_20120213_introduced.html |