CA SB103 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1861 of the Fish and Game Code, to add Sections 14105.6, 14110.1, 14110.2, 14110.3, and 14110.4 to the Government Code, to amend Section 3073.5 of the Labor Code, to amend Section 10140 of the Public Contract Code, and to amend Sections 800, 2038, 2192, and 2192.2 of, and to add Sections 800.5, 800.6, 800.7, 800.8, and 800.9 to, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB103 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - SB 103 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB103 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-29 - Assembly - SB 103 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB103 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 95, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-07-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1893.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 2397.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 11.) (June 26). |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2017-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1036.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.) |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1861 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14105.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14110.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14110.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14110.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14110.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Labor Code | 3073.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10140 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2038 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2192 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2192.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 800.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 800.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 800.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 800.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 800.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |