CA SB1029 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 93030) to Title 12 of, and to add and repeal Section 14533.4 of, the Government Code, to add Chapter 14 (commencing with Section 5880) to Division 5 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 105001, 105003, 105012, 105020, and 105095 of, to add Sections 105032.5 and 105088 to, and to repeal Sections 105104, 105105, and 105180 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

North Coast Railroad Authority: right-of-way: Great Redwood Trail Agency: Sonoma-Marin Area Rail Transit District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1029 McGuire (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4406.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4302.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4787.) (April 24).
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-04-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and N.R. & W.
2018-03-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code14111New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code14533.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Government Code93030New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5880New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5883Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code105001Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code105003Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code105012Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code105020Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code105032Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code105032.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code105088New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code105095Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code105104Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code105105Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code105180Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback