CA SB1010 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 5.5 (commencing with Section 2986) to Chapter 7 of Title 1 of Part 3 of the Penal Code, relating to parole.
Title
Parolees: Supportive Housing Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. John Moorlach [R] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1010 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - [03-20-2018] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB1010 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - [03-20-2018] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4452.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4301.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4418.) (March 20). |
2018-03-20 | Senate | March 20 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4418.) (March 20). |
2018-03-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 9. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 2985.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2985.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2985.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2985.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2985.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2986 | New Code | See Bill Text |