CA SB10 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1.4 (commencing with Section 14045.10) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health services: peer support specialist certification.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Marie Waldron [R] | Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] |
Asm. Tim Grayson [D] | Asm. Brian Maienschein [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB10 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 10 Beall Senate Third Reading By Waldron (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB10 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Assembly - SB 10 Beall Senate Third Reading By Waldron (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB10 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-17 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2609.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3042.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | June 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1194.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 490.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14045.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |