CA AR78 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Read. Adopted. (Page 3344.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-20 - Read. Adopted. (Page 3344.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to reproductive health care.
Title
Relative to reproductive health care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 3344.). |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (January 13). |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | Introduced. |