CA AR50 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-24-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4905.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-23 - Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4905.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lupus Awareness Month.
Title
Relative to Lupus Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4905.). |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | Introduced. |