CA AR36 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1284.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-19-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1284.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week.
Title
Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 1284.). |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Introduced. |