CA AR101 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Pride Month.
Title
Relative to Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, Transgender, and Queer (LGBTQ+) Pride Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 28). |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced. |