CA AJR32 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to infrastructure.
Title
The National Infrastructure Bank Act of 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Assembly - AJR 32 Nazarian Assembly Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-07-01 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0.) |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. To third reading pursuant to Joint Rule 22.1. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 20). |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |