CA AJR28 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-5)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-5)
Status: Passed on June 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to financial institutions.
Title
Financial institutions: cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR28 Jones-Sawyer et al. By McGuire (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AJR 28 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AJR 28 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 101, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4662.) |
2018-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 3. Page 5001.) |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Amended. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |