CA AJR27 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-4)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-4)
Status: Passed on August 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR27 Low et al. By McGuire (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AJR 27 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - AJR 27 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 168, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 3. Page 5437.) |
2018-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 2. Page 5205.) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 20). |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-03-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and PUB. S. |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |