CA AJR25 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of vessel anchorages.
Title
Regulation of vessel anchorages.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR25 Nguyen et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - AJR 25 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - AJR 25 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 148, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4881.) |
2022-08-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-10 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2022-01-15 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |