CA AJR16 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-12)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Condemnation of Anti-LGBT Actions in the Chechen Republic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Anti-LGBT Actions in the Chechen Republic.

Sponsors

Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D]
Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Sen. Ricardo Lara [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Raul Bocanegra [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D]Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Sebastian Ridley-Thomas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - AJR 16 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR16 Low et al. By Lara (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-29 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Assembly - AJR 16 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-19AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2017-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3101.).
2017-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-05SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2467.)
2017-08-31SenateAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29).
2017-07-06SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-06-27SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-06-26AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2345.)
2017-06-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-06-22AssemblyAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2017-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-05-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback