CA AJR10 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-19-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-01 - Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Republic of Korea veterans and Republic of Vietnam veterans who served in Vietnam.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans cemeteries: Republic of Korea and Republic of Vietnam veterans.

Sponsors

Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Sen. Tom Umberg [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent AJR10 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - [06-30-2021] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AJR 10 Choi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on M. & V.A. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-08-30SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
2021-08-17SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14).
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2021-06-30SenateIn committee: Refused adoption. Reconsideration granted.
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2021-05-10SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-05-06AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1332.)
2021-05-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-03AssemblyAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28).
2021-03-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2021-03-02AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-03-01AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback