CA ACR69 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the CHP Officer Dean Esquibel Memorial Bridge.
Title
CHP Officer Dean Esquibel Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 2nd Reading ACR69 Salas (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 69 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - ACR 69 SALAS Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-27 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-09-27 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2342.) |
2013-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2724.) |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2013-07-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-06-26 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |