CA ACR5 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-22)
Status: Passed on February 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-22)
Status: Passed on February 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Ronald Reagan Day.
Title
Ronald Reagan Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-15 - Senate - Special Consent Cal ACR5 Wilk (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 4, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-02-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:50 p.m. |
2013-02-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 160.) |
2013-02-13 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-04 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 235.) |
2013-01-31 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 31). |
2013-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | From printer. |
2013-01-16 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |