CA ACR38 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Alvarez.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Alvarez.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to freeway lids.
Title
Freeway lids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-14 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Alvarez. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 17). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |