CA ACR272 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-28 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-28 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to private employment.
Title
Careers in Construction Month.
Sponsors
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6647.) |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180ACR272 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180ACR272 |