CA ACR222 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Global Accessibility Awareness Day.
Title
Global Accessibility Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Asm. Adam Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Special Consent ACR222 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - ACR 222 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - ACR 222 GRAY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 92, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4516.) |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5134.) |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2018-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-04-16 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |