CA ACR2 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-17-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-17-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Korean American Day.
Title
Korean American Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent ACR2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-01 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1636.) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 158.) |
2021-01-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 11). |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-12-08 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-12-07 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |