CA ACR18 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-17)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Black History Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Black History Month.

Sponsors

Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Sen. Steven Bradford [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR18 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2021.
2021-04-07 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2021-03-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-03-01SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.)
2021-03-01SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-02-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-17SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-02-16AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-02-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-02-12AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (February 12).
2021-02-12AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-02AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-02-01AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback