CA ACR164 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month.
Title
Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Special Consent ACR164 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Assembly - ACR 164 Blanca Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Assembly - ACR 164 Blanca Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2020. |
2020-06-17 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3686.) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 4097.) |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 14). |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | From printer. |
2020-02-10 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |