CA ACR121 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-24-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 192, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-24-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 192, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Thomas H. Pohlman Memorial Interchange.
Title
Los Angeles County Deputy Sheriff Thomas H. Pohlman
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Assembly - ACR 121 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR121 Gomez By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - ACR 121 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading ACR121 Gomez By Hernandez (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - ACR 121 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 192, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6569.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6569.). |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5567.) |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Page 5483.) From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4357.) |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-03-08 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-01-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |