CA ACR120 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-11)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-11)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Maternal Health Awareness Day.
Title
Maternal Health Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Special Consent ACR120 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - ACR 120 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - ACR 120 Bauer-Kahan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-02-22 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2897.) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 3345.) |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 14). |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |