CA ACA28 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-13 - Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5866.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-13 - Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5866.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 9 of Article II, by amending Section 8 of Article III thereof, by amending Sections 3, 4, 7.5, 8, 10, 11, and 12 of Article IV thereof, by amending Sections 1, 2, 3, 6, 8, and 10.5 of, and adding Section 14 to, Article XIII B thereof, by amending Sections 8, 8.5, and 20 of Article XVI thereof, by amending Section 2 of Article XIX B thereof, and by amending Section 4 of Article XXXV thereof, relating to the Legislature.
Title
Legislature: revised biennial sessions and part-time
Sponsors
Asm. Tim Donnelly [R] | Asm. Beth Gaines [R] | Asm. Martin Garrick [R] | Sen. Shannon Grove [R] |
Asm. Linda Halderman [R] | Asm. Dave Jones [D] | Asm. Allan Mansoor [R] | Asm. Jeff Miller [R] |
Asm. Jim Silva [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-13 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5866.) | |
2012-07-02 | Referred to Coms. on BUDGET and RLS. | |
2012-05-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee June 10. | |
2012-05-10 | Read first time. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=aca_28&sess=1112&house=A |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/aca_28_bill_20120510_introduced.html |