CA ABX118 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-14 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-14 - Died on third reading file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 33 (commencing with Section 7599) to Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 6051.7, 6201.7, 10752, 10752.1, 17041, 17054, and 17062 of, and to add Sections 7101.4, 10752.2, and 11001.6 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government finance, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
The Schools and Local Public Safety Protection Act of
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB18 Blumenfield Urgency Clause (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB18 Blumenfield Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - Assembly - AB 18 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading First Extraordinary Session (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Supp 1 AB18 Blumenfield Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-03 - Assembly - AB 18 BLUMENFIELD Assembly Third Reading First Extraordinary Session (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-14 | Died on third reading file. | |
2011-06-10 | Pursuant to Joint Rule 33.1, Joint Rule 10.5 suspended by unanimous consent. (Page 132.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 132.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 133.) | |
2011-06-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2011-06-08 | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2011-06-06 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-06-03 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 21. Page 177.) | |
2011-06-02 | Without reference to committee. Ordered to second reading. (Page 171.) Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2011-05-20 | From printer. | |
2011-05-19 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7599 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 10752 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 10752.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 10752.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 11001.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17054 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19136.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6051.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 6201.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7101.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |