CA AB959 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5558.5 to the Public Resources Code, relating to park districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Park districts: ordinances: nuisances: abatement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 959 Mullin Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB959 Mullin et al. By Becker (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 959 Mullin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-23 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 268, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-23 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2021-09-02AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
2021-09-02AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16.)
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-07-06SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-05SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 1).
2021-06-18SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-05-28SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.)
2021-05-11AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-10AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-05-06AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 5).
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2021-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
2021-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code5558.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB959
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB959#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB959#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB959#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB959#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB959#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB959#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB959#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220AB959

Bill Comments

feedback