CA AB958 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 110.5 to, and to repeal Sections 1670.2, 2230.5, 2960.05, 3137, 3750.51, 4982.05, 4990.32, 5561, 5661, 7686.5, 9884.20, and 9889.8 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to regulatory boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory boards: limitations periods.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2011-03-10 Referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
2011-02-20 From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2011-02-18 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code110.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Business and Professions Code1670.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2230.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code2960.05Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3137Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code3750.51Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4982.05Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code4990.32Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5561Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5661Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code7686.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9884.20Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code9889.8Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback